E
|
06/14/2013
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/25/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3737
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4914
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3280
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2910
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2265
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#937
|
Journal Page: 3698
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3698
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3698
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3684
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3684
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3521
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 1677
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1677
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1580
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 942
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 904
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 904
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 904
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 904
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 904
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 904
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 904
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Estes
|
Journal Page: 904
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 904
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 903
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 753
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 363
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 363
|
Senate
|
02/27/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|