E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3861
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3762
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4966
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1300
|
Journal Page: 4966
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4965
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5385
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3742
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3367
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3131
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3131
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4567
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4567
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4291
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4291
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4291
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2704
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2704
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2704
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2704
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2702
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2051
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3596
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#924
|
Journal Page: 3599
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3599
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3599
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3579
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Amended
|
3-Howard
|
Journal Page: 3581
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3579
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3193
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 1733
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1733
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1654
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1119
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 980
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 980
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 980
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 980
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 980
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 980
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 980
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 754
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 364
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 364
|
Senate
|
02/27/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|