E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/26/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3834
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5381
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3515
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3068
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2265
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#937
|
Journal Page: 3698
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3698
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3698
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3684
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3684
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3521
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2545
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2545
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1849
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1312
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 912
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 364
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 364
|
Senate
|
02/27/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|