Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB922 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Birdwell S.B. No. 922
 (In the Senate - Filed February 28, 2013; March 12, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 11, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 11, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to partnerships between the Texas State Technical College
 System and public junior colleges.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 135, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter D to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER D.  PARTNERSHIPS BETWEEN TEXAS STATE TECHNICAL COLLEGE
 SYSTEM AND PUBLIC JUNIOR COLLEGES
 Sec. 135.101.  DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "public
 junior college" has the meaning assigned by Section 61.003.
 Sec. 135.102.  PARTNERSHIP AGREEMENTS. (a)  With the
 approval of the coordinating board, the board and a public junior
 college may enter into a partnership agreement designed to
 coordinate the management and operations of the institutions and to
 enhance the delivery of technical education programs across this
 state. The agreement does not abrogate the powers and duties of the
 boards with regard to the governance of their respective
 institutions.
 (b)  A partnership agreement under this subchapter must:
 (1)  provide that the participating institutions, in
 conjunction with the local community, identify and offer courses
 that will meet the educational and workforce development goals for
 the region;
 (2)  provide that program offerings receive approval
 from the coordinating board;
 (3)  provide for the distribution of responsibilities
 regarding specific program offerings and resulting awards;
 (4)  provide for the distribution of tuition, fees, and
 state funds associated with formula funding regarding program
 offerings; and
 (5)  comply with applicable rules of the coordinating
 board relating to contractual agreements.
 (c)  A partnership agreement between the system and a public
 junior college under this subchapter is considered to be in
 compliance with Sections 135.04(b) and (c).
 Sec. 135.103.  JOINT USE OF PERSONNEL. The governing boards
 of the participating institutions may fill by joint appointment any
 administrative, faculty, or support position necessary for the
 operation of the institutions.
 Sec. 135.104.  SUPPORT SERVICES. The governing boards of
 the participating institutions may assign the management and
 operation of selected services, including maintenance of buildings
 and grounds, operation of auxiliary enterprises, and operation of a
 jointly supported library, to one of the institutions in order to
 achieve cost-effectiveness.
 Sec. 135.105.  FACILITIES. (a)  The participating
 institutions may, under the terms of the partnership agreement,
 make provisions for adequate physical facilities for use by the
 institutions.
 (b)  The participating institutions may individually or
 collectively lease, purchase, finance, construct, or rehabilitate
 physical facilities under this section appropriate to partnership
 needs.  The owning or financing of facilities under this section
 promotes the public purpose of supporting higher education and
 further promotes the public purpose of developing and diversifying
 the economy of this state and eliminating unemployment and
 underemployment in this state under the authority granted by
 Section 52-a, Article III, Texas Constitution.
 (c)  A participating institution of higher education may
 lease facilities from or to another participating institution for
 administrative and instructional purposes.
 (d)  Participating institutions may solicit, accept, and
 administer, on terms and conditions acceptable to the participating
 institutions, gifts, grants, or donations of any kind and from any
 source for facilities and equipment.
 (e)  A facility used for the purposes of a partnership
 agreement under this subchapter is not considered a facility used
 to operate an extension program under Section 135.06.
 Sec. 135.106.  STATE FUNDING. The system is entitled to
 receive state appropriations on the same formula basis as if the
 system did not enter into a partnership agreement under this
 subchapter, and any other participating institution of higher
 education is entitled to state appropriations on the same formula
 basis as other similar institutions of higher education.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *