1 | 1 | | By: Paxton, Campbell S.B. No. 929 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed February 28, 2013; March 12, 2013, |
---|
3 | 3 | | read first time and referred to Committee on Education; |
---|
4 | 4 | | April 4, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
5 | 5 | | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 1; April 4, 2013, |
---|
6 | 6 | | sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 929 By: Paxton |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
11 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
12 | 12 | | relating to equal opportunity for access by home-schooled students |
---|
13 | 13 | | to University Interscholastic League-sponsored activities; |
---|
14 | 14 | | authorizing a fee. |
---|
15 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
16 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 33, Education Code, is |
---|
17 | 17 | | amended by adding Section 33.0833 to read as follows: |
---|
18 | 18 | | Sec. 33.0833. EQUAL OPPORTUNITY FOR HOME-SCHOOLED STUDENTS |
---|
19 | 19 | | TO PARTICIPATE IN UNIVERSITY INTERSCHOLASTIC LEAGUE ACTIVITIES. |
---|
20 | 20 | | (a) In this section, "home-schooled student" has the meaning |
---|
21 | 21 | | assigned by Section 29.916. |
---|
22 | 22 | | (b) Except as provided by Subsection (g), a public school |
---|
23 | 23 | | that participates in an activity sponsored by the University |
---|
24 | 24 | | Interscholastic League shall provide a home-schooled student, who |
---|
25 | 25 | | otherwise meets league eligibility standards to represent that |
---|
26 | 26 | | school in a league activity, with the opportunity to participate in |
---|
27 | 27 | | the activity on behalf of the school in the same manner that the |
---|
28 | 28 | | school provides the opportunity to participate to students enrolled |
---|
29 | 29 | | in the school. |
---|
30 | 30 | | (c) A home-schooled student who seeks to participate or who |
---|
31 | 31 | | participates in a league activity on behalf of a school is subject |
---|
32 | 32 | | to the relevant policies that apply to students enrolled in the |
---|
33 | 33 | | school, including policies regarding registration, age |
---|
34 | 34 | | eligibility, fees, insurance, transportation, physical condition, |
---|
35 | 35 | | qualifications, responsibilities, event schedules, standards of |
---|
36 | 36 | | behavior, and performance. |
---|
37 | 37 | | (d) The parent or legal guardian of a home-schooled student |
---|
38 | 38 | | is responsible for oversight of academic standards relating to the |
---|
39 | 39 | | student's participation in a league activity. As a condition of |
---|
40 | 40 | | eligibility to participate in a league activity during the first |
---|
41 | 41 | | six weeks of a school year, a home-schooled student must |
---|
42 | 42 | | demonstrate grade-level academic proficiency on any nationally |
---|
43 | 43 | | recognized, norm-referenced assessment instrument, including the |
---|
44 | 44 | | Iowa Test of Basic Skills, Stanford Achievement Test, California |
---|
45 | 45 | | Achievement Test, and Comprehensive Test of Basic Skills. A |
---|
46 | 46 | | home-schooled student demonstrates the required academic |
---|
47 | 47 | | proficiency by achieving a composite, core, or survey score that is |
---|
48 | 48 | | within the average or higher than average range of scores, as |
---|
49 | 49 | | established by the applicable testing service. For purposes of |
---|
50 | 50 | | this subsection, a school district shall accept assessment results |
---|
51 | 51 | | administered or reported by a third party. |
---|
52 | 52 | | (e) A home-schooled student's demonstration of academic |
---|
53 | 53 | | proficiency under Subsection (d) is sufficient for purposes of that |
---|
54 | 54 | | subsection for the school year in which the student achieves the |
---|
55 | 55 | | required score and the subsequent school year. |
---|
56 | 56 | | (f) After the first six weeks of a school year, the parent or |
---|
57 | 57 | | legal guardian of a home-schooled student participating in a league |
---|
58 | 58 | | activity on behalf of a public school must periodically, in |
---|
59 | 59 | | accordance with the school's grading calendar, provide written |
---|
60 | 60 | | verification to the school indicating that the student is receiving |
---|
61 | 61 | | a passing grade in each course or subject being taught. |
---|
62 | 62 | | (g) A home-schooled student is not authorized by this |
---|
63 | 63 | | section to participate in a league activity during the remainder of |
---|
64 | 64 | | any school year during which the student was previously enrolled in |
---|
65 | 65 | | a public school. |
---|
66 | 66 | | (h) The University Interscholastic League may not prohibit |
---|
67 | 67 | | a home-schooled student from participating in league activities in |
---|
68 | 68 | | the manner authorized by this section. |
---|
69 | 69 | | (i) This section expires July 1, 2017. |
---|
70 | 70 | | SECTION 2. Effective July 1, 2017, Subchapter D, Chapter |
---|
71 | 71 | | 33, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 33.0834 to read as |
---|
72 | 72 | | follows: |
---|
73 | 73 | | Sec. 33.0834. EQUAL OPPORTUNITY FOR HOME-SCHOOLED STUDENTS |
---|
74 | 74 | | TO PARTICIPATE IN UNIVERSITY INTERSCHOLASTIC LEAGUE ACTIVITIES. |
---|
75 | 75 | | (a) In this section, "home-schooled student" has the meaning |
---|
76 | 76 | | assigned by Section 29.916. |
---|
77 | 77 | | (b) Notwithstanding the expiration of Section 33.0833, as |
---|
78 | 78 | | added by S.B. 929, Acts of the 83rd Legislature, Regular Session, |
---|
79 | 79 | | 2013, a home-schooled student who participated in an activity |
---|
80 | 80 | | sponsored by the University Interscholastic League under the |
---|
81 | 81 | | authority of that section before July 1, 2017, may continue to |
---|
82 | 82 | | participate in the same league activity on the same terms |
---|
83 | 83 | | previously specified by that section. |
---|
84 | 84 | | (c) This section expires July 1, 2030. |
---|
85 | 85 | | SECTION 3. This Act applies beginning with the 2013-2014 |
---|
86 | 86 | | school year. |
---|
87 | 87 | | SECTION 4. Except as otherwise provided by this Act: |
---|
88 | 88 | | (1) this Act takes effect immediately if it receives a |
---|
89 | 89 | | vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
90 | 90 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution; and |
---|
91 | 91 | | (2) if this Act does not receive the vote necessary for |
---|
92 | 92 | | immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|
93 | 93 | | * * * * * |
---|