E
|
05/18/2013
|
Effective on 1/1/14
|
|
|
E
|
05/18/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
E
|
05/08/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1674
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2758
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1595
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1674
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2720
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1526
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1526
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1526
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1526
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1339
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2054
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#398
|
Journal Page: 2053
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2053
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2053
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2020
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2020
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Amended
|
1-S. Davis
|
Journal Page: 2020
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2019
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 1987
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1987
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
CSHB 1782
|
Journal Page: 1987
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 1494
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1494
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 963
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 609
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 568
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 568
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 568
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 568
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 568
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 568
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 568
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 486
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 333
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 333
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|