House | 04/16/2013 | Referred to Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 1578 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1578 | |
House | 04/01/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1190 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 680 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 642 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 642 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 642 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 642 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 642 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 642 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Amended | Journal Page: 641 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Carona | Journal Page: 641 |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 641 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 641 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 569 | |
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 417 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 417 | |
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |