E | 05/02/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 05/02/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1434 | |
E | 04/24/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1203 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1826 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1178 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1203 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1139 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1751 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Record vote | RV#273 | Journal Page: 1750 |
House | 04/23/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1750 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1750 | |
House | 04/22/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1726 | |
House | 04/22/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1726 | |
House | 04/22/2013 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1894 | Journal Page: 1726 |
House | 04/19/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1698 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Referred to Technology | Journal Page: 1559 | |
House | 04/15/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1559 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1496 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 799 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 774 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 774 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 774 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 774 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 774 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 774 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 774 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 623 | |
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 417 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 417 | |
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |