E | 05/14/2013 | See remarks for effective date | ||
E | 05/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1810 | |
E | 05/02/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1408 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2274 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1406 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1408 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1339 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2052 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Record vote | RV#396 | Journal Page: 2051 |
House | 04/30/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2051 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2051 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1998 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1998 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1998 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 3790 | Journal Page: 1998 |
House | 04/25/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1913 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1559 | |
House | 04/15/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1559 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1496 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 799 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 771 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 771 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 771 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 771 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 770 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Amended | Journal Page: 770 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Birdwell | Journal Page: 770 |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 770 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 770 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 770 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 680 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 418 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 418 | |
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |