Senate | 05/10/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1728 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1170 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 418 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 418 | |
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |