Senate | 03/28/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 660 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 243 | |
Senate | 01/28/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 95 | |
Senate | 01/28/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 95 | |
Senate | 11/12/2012 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/12/2012 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |