E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3853
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5384
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3513
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3513
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3053
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4502
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1173
|
Journal Page: 4501
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4501
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 2877
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2402
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2402
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3995
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3995
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3694
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3694
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3694
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2000
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2000
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2000
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1999
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1996
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1421
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2211
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#439
|
Journal Page: 2211
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2211
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2211
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2138
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2138
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2138
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 2685
|
Journal Page: 2138
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2163
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1559
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1559
|
House
|
04/12/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1543
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 912
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 832
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 832
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 832
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 832
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 831
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 831
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 831
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 882
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 753
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 752
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 418
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 418
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|