E | 06/14/2013 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3869 | |
E | 05/25/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3737 | |
House | 05/25/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4914 | |
Senate | 05/24/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3280 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2910 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2167 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Record vote | RV#951 | Journal Page: 3751 |
House | 05/20/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3751 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3751 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3614 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3614 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3614 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1982 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1455 | |
House | 04/08/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1455 | |
House | 04/04/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1426 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 754 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 713 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 713 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 713 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 713 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 713 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 713 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 713 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 730 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 660 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 419 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 419 | |
Senate | 03/01/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/01/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |