E | 05/24/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 05/24/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3396 | |
E | 05/13/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1765 | |
House | 05/13/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3190 | |
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1759 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1728 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1695 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Record vote | RV#669 | Journal Page: 2765 |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2765 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2765 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2746 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2746 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1749 | Journal Page: 2746 |
House | 05/07/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2722 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform | Journal Page: 1824 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1824 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1827 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1203 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1154 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1154 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1154 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1154 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1154 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1154 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1154 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Referred to Open Government | Journal Page: 419 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 419 | |
Senate | 03/01/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/01/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |