House | 05/20/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/20/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4076 | |
House | 05/15/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 1824 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1824 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1773 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1172 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1095 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1095 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1095 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1094 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1094 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1094 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1094 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 912 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 420 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 420 | |
Senate | 03/01/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/01/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |