House | 04/29/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1734 | |
House | 04/22/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1734 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1628 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 976 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 925 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 925 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 925 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 925 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 924 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 924 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 924 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 753 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 420 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 420 | |
Senate | 03/01/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/01/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |