E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/25/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3737
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4914
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3280
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2910
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2056
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3596
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#924
|
Journal Page: 3602
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 3602
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Laid before the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3587
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2550
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 1495
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 963
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 568
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 568
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 568
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 568
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 518
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 216
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 216
|
Senate
|
02/05/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|