E | 04/24/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1258 | |
E | 04/18/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1073 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1650 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 989 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1073 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 947 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1591 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1591 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1495 | |
House | 04/01/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1189 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 658 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 658 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 658 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 658 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 609 | |
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 442 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 442 | |
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |