E | 03/13/2013 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 487 | |
House | 03/13/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 732 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 404 | |
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 444 | |
Senate | 03/11/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 392 | |
House | 03/07/2013 | Record vote | RV#59 | Journal Page: 649 |
House | 03/07/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 649 | |
House | 03/07/2013 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 649 | |
House | 03/07/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 660 | |
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 376 | |
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Read | Journal Page: 376 | |
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 376 | |
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |