E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3869 | |
E | 05/27/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3867 | |
House | 05/26/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5381 | |
Senate | 05/26/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3778 | |
Senate | 05/24/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3737 | |
Senate | 05/23/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2924 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4169 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Record vote | RV#1057 | Journal Page: 4169 |
House | 05/22/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4169 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4153 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3910 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Referred to International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs | Journal Page: 3362 | |
House | 05/15/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3368 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1818 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1818 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1818 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1818 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1673 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 513 | |
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 513 | |
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |