E | 05/18/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2258 | |
E | 05/13/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1765 | |
House | 05/13/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3190 | |
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1759 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1728 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1702 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2847 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2847 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2842 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 1673 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |