E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3869 | |
E | 05/26/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3835 | |
House | 05/26/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5381 | |
Senate | 05/25/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3515 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3068 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2405 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3918 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 3918 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3693 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 2033 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |