E | 02/07/2013 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 190 | |
House | 02/06/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 276 | |
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 156 | |
Senate | 02/04/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 170 | |
Senate | 02/04/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 147 | |
House | 01/31/2013 | Record vote | RV#28 | Journal Page: 211 |
House | 01/31/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 211 | |
House | 01/31/2013 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 210 | |
House | 01/31/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 219 | |
Senate | 01/30/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 139 | |
Senate | 01/30/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 139 | |
Senate | 01/30/2013 | Read | Journal Page: 139 | |
Senate | 01/30/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 139 | |
Senate | 01/30/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/30/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |