House | 05/08/2013 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 2840 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2840 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2160 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1408 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1349 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1349 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1349 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1349 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1349 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1349 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1349 | |
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1330 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1312 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Reported from s/c favorably with substitute | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 620 | |
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair | ||
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 127 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 127 | |
Senate | 01/08/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/08/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |