|
05/30/2013
|
Filed with the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
E
|
05/21/2013
|
Filed with the Secretary of State
|
|
Journal Page: 2567
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3898
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2069
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1924
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#874
|
Journal Page: 3434
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 3434
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3433
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Postponed
|
5/16/13 1:50 PM
|
Journal Page: 3421
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3421
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2365
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Referred to Investments & Financial Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1579
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1579
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 732
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 487
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 409
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 409
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 409
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 409
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 409
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 409
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 409
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 218
|
Senate
|
02/12/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 127
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 127
|
Senate
|
01/15/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|