Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR26 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            83R5952 KLA-D
 By: Estes S.J.R. No. 26


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment to prohibit using revenues,
 other money, or account or fund balances dedicated by law for
 nondedicated general governmental purposes and to limit using that
 money or those balances for certification of appropriations for
 nondedicated purposes or entities.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 49a, Article III, Texas Constitution, is
 amended by adding Subsections (c), (d), and (e) to read as follows:
 (c)  In making the determinations necessary for the
 Comptroller of Public Accounts to endorse the certificate under
 Subsection (b) of this section, the Comptroller may not consider
 any portion of any revenue of or money received by this state, or
 any account or fund balance, that by law has been dedicated to a
 particular purpose or entity as available for the purpose of
 certifying that the amount of appropriations for any other purpose
 or entity is within the amount estimated to be available in the
 affected funds. The Legislature may not by general law make an
 unappropriated balance of a dedicated account or fund available for
 general governmental purposes or certification except by expressly
 repealing the dedication.
 (d)  Notwithstanding Subsection (c) of this section and only
 to the extent authorized by general law, the Comptroller may
 consider:
 (1)  for appropriations for any part of the state
 fiscal year beginning September 1, 2015, not more than 37.5 percent
 of the total amount of revenue of or money received by this state,
 or any account or fund balance, that by law has been dedicated to a
 particular purpose or entity and that, on August 31, 2015, the
 Comptroller estimates to exceed the total amount of such revenues,
 money, and balances appropriated by the General Appropriations Act
 or other laws enacted by the 83rd Legislature, as available for the
 purpose of certifying that the amount of appropriations for any
 nondedicated purpose or entity is within the amount estimated to be
 available in the affected funds;
 (2)  for appropriations for any part of the state
 fiscal year beginning September 1, 2016, not more than 25 percent of
 the total amount of revenue of or money received by this state, or
 any account or fund balance, that by law has been dedicated to a
 particular purpose or entity and that, on August 31, 2015, the
 Comptroller estimates to exceed the total amount of such revenues,
 money, and balances appropriated by the General Appropriations Act
 or other laws enacted by the 83rd Legislature, as available for the
 purpose of certifying that the amount of appropriations for any
 nondedicated purpose or entity is within the amount estimated to be
 available in the affected funds; and
 (3)  for appropriations for any part of the state
 fiscal year beginning September 1, 2017, not more than 12.5 percent
 of the total amount of revenue of or money received by this state,
 or any account or fund balance, that by law has been dedicated to a
 particular purpose or entity and that, on August 31, 2017, the
 Comptroller estimates to exceed the total amount of such revenues,
 money, and balances appropriated by the General Appropriations Act
 or other laws enacted by the 84th Legislature, as available for the
 purpose of certifying that the amount of appropriations for any
 nondedicated purpose or entity is within the amount estimated to be
 available in the affected funds.
 (e)  This subsection and Subsection (d) of this section
 expire September 1, 2018.
 SECTION 2.  Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 26 to read as follows:
 Sec. 26.  Revenue of or money received by this state from one
 or more particular sources or held in or deposited to an identified
 account or fund inside or outside the state treasury the
 appropriation or expenditure of which at the time the revenue is
 collected or the money is received by the state is dedicated by
 general law to one or more particular purposes or for one or more
 particular entities may not be appropriated or expended for any
 purpose, or to or by any entity, other than a purpose or entity to
 which the revenue or money is dedicated unless the legislature
 expressly repeals the dedication.
 SECTION 3.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION.  (a)  This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 83rd Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2013, to prohibit using revenues, other money, or
 account or fund balances dedicated by law for nondedicated general
 governmental purposes and to limit using that money or those
 balances for certification of appropriations for nondedicated
 purposes or entities.
 (b)  The amendment to Section 49a, Article III, of this
 constitution takes effect January 1, 2015, and applies only to the
 certification of an appropriation authorized for all or part of a
 state fiscal year beginning on or after September 1, 2015.
 (c)  Section 26, Article VIII, of this constitution takes
 effect September 1, 2015, and applies only to appropriations
 authorized for all or part of, or expenditures during, a state
 fiscal year beginning on or after that date.
 (d)  This temporary provision expires January 1, 2016.
 SECTION 4.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 5, 2013.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment to end fee and other
 revenue diversions by prohibiting using certain money dedicated by
 law for nondedicated purposes or entities and to limit using that
 money to certify appropriations for nondedicated purposes or
 entities."