House
|
05/19/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3910
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3348
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 1734
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1734
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1072
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1628
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 976
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 919
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 919
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 919
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 919
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 919
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 919
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 918
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 780
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 620
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
No action taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 216
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 216
|
Senate
|
02/11/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|