Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR47 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            83R12224 KLA-D
 By: Eltife S.J.R. No. 47


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment increasing the rate of the
 state sales and use tax and dedicating revenue derived from that
 rate increase to repaying certain transportation bonds.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 32 to read as follows:
 Sec. 32.  (a)  The state sales and use tax imposed on the
 sale, storage, use, or other consumption in this state of a taxable
 item under Chapter 151, Tax Code, or its successor is imposed at a
 rate that is one-half of one percent more than the rates prescribed
 by general law.
 (b)  The comptroller of public accounts shall deposit the net
 revenue derived from the state sales and use tax described by
 Subsection (a) of this section at a rate of one-half of one percent
 to the credit of an account in the general revenue fund. Interest
 earned on the account must be credited to the account.
 (c)  Revenue deposited in the account under Subsection (b) of
 this section and interest credited to the account may be used only
 to repay the principal of and interest on general obligation bonds
 issued by or on behalf of the Texas Department of Transportation on
 or before January 1, 2013, or the principal of and interest on any
 refunding bonds issued to repay those bonds.
 (d)  This section expires on the earlier of:
 (1)  September 1, 2030; or
 (2)  the date the principal of and interest on all bonds
 described by Subsection (c) of this section are paid.
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a)  This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 83rd Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2013, increasing the rate of the state sales and
 use tax and dedicating revenue derived from that rate increase to
 repaying certain transportation bonds.
 (b)  Section 32, Article VIII, of this constitution takes
 effect January 1, 2014.
 (c)  This temporary provision expires September 2, 2015.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 5, 2013.
 The ballot shall be printed to provide for voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment increasing the rate of
 the state sales and use tax by one-half of one percent and
 dedicating revenue derived from that rate increase to repaying
 certain transportation bonds."