Senate | 04/18/2013 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations | Journal Page: 514 | |
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 514 | |
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |