Senate | 03/12/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 444 | |
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 384 | |
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 334 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 126 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 126 | |
Senate | 11/12/2012 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/12/2012 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |