Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR1067 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Duncan S.R. No. 1067


 SENATE RESOLUTION
 BE IT RESOLVED by the Senate of the State of Texas, 83rd
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2013, That Senate Rule 12.03 be
 suspended in part as provided by Senate Rule 12.08 to enable the
 conference committee appointed to resolve the differences on
 Senate Bill 1458 (contributions to, benefits from, and the
 administration of systems and programs administered by the
 Teacher Retirement System of Texas) to consider and take action
 on the following matters:
 (1)  Senate Rule 12.03(1) is suspended to permit the
 committee to change, alter, or amend text not in disagreement in
 proposed SECTION 2 of the bill, in added Section 824.702(c),
 Government Code, to read as follows:
 (c)  If the annuitant:
 (1)  is a retiree, or is a beneficiary under an
 optional retirement payment plan, to be eligible for the
 adjustment under this section:
 (A)  the annuitant must be living on the
 effective date of the adjustment; and
 (B)  the effective date of the retirement of
 the member of the Teacher Retirement System of Texas must have
 been on or before August 31, 2004;
 (2)  is a beneficiary under Section 824.402(a)(3) or
 (4) or 824.502, to be eligible for the adjustment:
 (A)  the annuitant must be living on the
 effective date of the adjustment; and
 (B)  the date of death of the member of the
 retirement system must have been on or before August 31, 2004; or
 (3)  is an alternate payee under Section 804.005, the
 annuitant is eligible for the adjustment only if the effective
 date of the election to receive the annuity payment was on or
 before August 31, 2004.
 Explanation: The change is necessary to ensure that the
 date used to determine eligibility for a cost-of-living
 adjustment across different categories of annuitants under
 Section 824.702, Government Code, is August 31, 2004, instead of
 August 31, 1999.
 (2)  Senate Rules 12.03(1) and (3) are suspended to permit
 the committee to change, alter, or amend text and to add text on a
 matter not in disagreement in proposed SECTION 15 of the bill,
 the effective date provision of the bill, to read as follows:
 SECTION 15.  (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b) of
 this section, this Act takes effect September 1, 2014.
 (b)  Section 824.702, Government Code, as added by this
 Act, Section 825.402, Government Code, as amended by this Act,
 and the repeal by this Act of Section 1579.103, Insurance Code,
 take effect September 1, 2013.
 Explanation: The change in the effective date provision
 is a technical change necessary to ensure that Section 824.702,
 Government Code, adding a cost-of-living adjustment for certain
 annuitants under the Teacher Retirement System of Texas, takes
 effect in time to provide the adjustment provided for under that
 section.
  _______________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on May 25, 2013, by the
 following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 0.
  _______________________________
  Secretary of the Senate