Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR237

Caption

Recognizing February 19, 2013, as Corsicana and Navarro County Day at the State Capitol.

Impact

The resolution emphasizes the importance of Corsicana's multifaceted economy, which includes advanced manufacturing, information technology, as well as traditional agriculture and oil industries. It acknowledges recent developments, such as the planned expansion of a local manufacturing plant by Pactiv LLC, which will create jobs and contribute to the economic growth of the region. The resolution serves as a reminder of the local efforts to boost the economy and attract business, showcasing the community’s commitment to progress while honoring its heritage.

Summary

Senate Resolution 237 recognizes February 19, 2013, as Corsicana and Navarro County Day at the State Capitol. The resolution celebrates the rich history and economic contributions of Corsicana and Navarro County, highlighting their significance in the state of Texas. The area has a storied past, including its initial settlement by various Native American tribes and early Anglo-American settlers, its development as a hub for agriculture and trade, and its role in the Texas oil boom that began in the 1890s.

Sentiment

The sentiment around SR237 is overwhelmingly positive, reflecting a strong sense of pride among the citizens of Corsicana and Navarro County. The resolution not only recognizes their contributions to the state but also celebrates their community spirit and resilience. The gathering at the State Capitol serves as an opportunity for local residents to showcase their history, culture, and economic achievements to the wider public, embodying a collective pride in their identity.

Contention

While resolutions such as SR237 are generally uncontroversial, there may exist underlying tensions regarding how local celebrations are funded and recognized at the state level. However, the primary focus of this resolution is to promote community bonds and heritage rather than to make policy changes or allocate funding, thus steering clear of contentious legislative debates. The resolution instead represents a hallmark of unity and acknowledgment of local contributions to the state's history.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

TX SR333

Recognizing March 10, 2015, as Corsicana and Navarro County Day.

TX SR362

Recognizing March 7, 2017, as Corsicana and Navarro County Day.

TX HR16

Recognizing March 10, 2011, as Corsicana/Navarro County Day at the State Capitol.

TX SR456

Recognizing March 10, 2011, as Corsicana and Navarro County Day at the State Capitol.

TX SB2054

Relating to the transfer of certain state property from the Texas Juvenile Justice Department to the State Orphans Home Alumni Association.

TX HR82

In memory of Dr. Kent Rogers of Corsicana.

TX HR269

Recognizing February 19, 2013, as Corsicana/Navarro County Day at the State Capitol.

TX SR246

Recognizing March 18, 2025, as Corsicana/Navarro County Day.