Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate 2013 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR39

Instructing the enrolling clerk of the senate to make corrections in S.B. No. 1116.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR4

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 9, 2013, and ending on Monday, January 14, 2013.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR40

Instructing the enrolling clerk of the senate to make corrections in S.B. No. 347.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR41

Instructing the enrolling clerk of the senate to make corrections in S.B. No. 1727.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR42

Instructing the enrolling clerk of the senate to make corrections to S.B. No. 217.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR43

Instructing the enrolling clerk of the senate to make corrections in S.J.R. No. 1.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR44

Instructing the enrolling clerk of the senate to make corrections to S.B. No. 8.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR45

Instructing the enrolling clerk of the senate to make corrections to S.B. No. 1747.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR46

Commending the City of Pharr, South Texas College, the Pharr Police Department, and the Pharr-San Juan-Alamo Independent School District for their collaborative efforts to develop the Regional Center for Public Safety Excellence.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR47

Instructing the enrolling clerk of the senate to make corrections to S.B. No. 2.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR48

Instructing the enrolling clerk of the senate to make corrections in S.B. No. 1678.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR49

Instructing the enrolling clerk of the senate to make corrections to S.B. No. 2.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR5

Inviting the governor to address a joint session of the legislature on January 29, 2013.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR6

Urging Congress to reimburse the State of Texas for bearing the financial burden of the federal government's responsibility to secure the Texas-Mexico international border during the 2012-2013 budget cycle.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR7

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 23, 2013, and ending on Monday, January 28, 2013.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records