E | 07/11/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1147 | |
E | 06/24/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1147 | |
Senate | 06/21/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 71 | |
House | 06/20/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1041 | |
House | 06/17/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1042 | |
House | 06/17/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 21 | |
Senate | 06/12/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 20 | |
Senate | 06/12/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 20 | |
Senate | 06/12/2013 | Read | Journal Page: 20 | |
Senate | 06/12/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 20 | |
Senate | 05/30/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 11 | |
House | 05/28/2013 | Record vote | RV#2 | Journal Page: 3 |
House | 05/28/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3 | |
House | 05/28/2013 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 3 | |
House | 05/28/2013 | Filed |