Texas 2013 - 83rd 1st C.S.

Texas House Bill HJR14 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            83S10121 CJC-D
 By: Phillips H.J.R. No. 14


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment dedicating certain revenue
 derived from the tax imposed on the sale of motor vehicles to the
 state highway fund.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 7-e to read as follows:
 Sec. 7-e.  (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
 section, the net revenue derived from the tax authorized by Chapter
 152, Tax Code, or its successor, and imposed on the sale of a motor
 vehicle sold in this state shall be deposited to the credit of the
 state highway fund and may be appropriated only:
 (1)  for a purpose authorized by Section 7-a, Article
 VIII, of this constitution; or
 (2)  to repay the principal and interest on general
 obligation bonds issued as authorized by Section 49-p, Article III,
 of this constitution.
 (b)  Subsection (a) of this section does not apply to any
 revenue described by that subsection that, under general law in
 effect on January 1, 2013, was required to be deposited to the
 credit of a fund outside the general revenue fund from which money
 could be appropriated only for a purpose that decreases the rates
 of, or reduces reliance on, ad valorem taxes imposed to fund public
 schools. To the extent general law continues to require the deposit
 of that revenue in that manner and limit the appropriation of that
 revenue to that purpose, the requirement and limitation prevail
 over Subsection (a) of this section.
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION.  (a) This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 83rd Legislature,
 1st Called Session, 2013, dedicating certain revenue derived from
 the tax imposed on the sale of a motor vehicle sold in this state to
 the state highway fund.
 (b)  The changes to Article VIII of this constitution made by
 the amendment take effect September 1, 2024.
 (c)  Beginning with the state fiscal year beginning on
 September 1, 2024, the legislature may not appropriate any revenue
 to which Section 7-e(a), Article VIII, of this constitution applies
 for any purpose other than a purpose described by Section 7-e(a),
 Article VIII, of this constitution.
 (d)  In each state fiscal year that begins on or after
 September 1, 2015, but before September 1, 2024, the legislature
 shall decrease in equal increments each year the amount of revenue
 to which Section 7-e(a), Article VIII, of this constitution applies
 that is appropriated for any purpose other than a purpose described
 by Section 7-e(a), Article VIII, of this constitution as necessary
 to comply with Subsection (c) of this temporary provision beginning
 September 1, 2024.
 (e)  This temporary provision expires September 1, 2025.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 5, 2013.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment dedicating certain
 revenue derived from the tax imposed on a sale of a motor vehicle
 sold in this state to the state highway fund."