Senate
|
06/12/2013
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Referred to Redistricting, Select
|
|
Journal Page: 8
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 8
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|