E
|
06/26/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/26/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 309
|
E
|
06/24/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 285
|
Senate
|
06/23/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 279
|
House
|
06/23/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1114
|
Senate
|
06/23/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 285
|
Senate
|
06/23/2013
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 279
|
House
|
06/21/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1067
|
House
|
06/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#21
|
Journal Page: 1066
|
House
|
06/21/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1066
|
House
|
06/21/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1066
|
House
|
06/21/2013
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 1048
|
House
|
06/21/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1048
|
House
|
06/20/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1033
|
House
|
06/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#16
|
Journal Page: 1032
|
House
|
06/20/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1032
|
House
|
06/20/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1032
|
House
|
06/20/2013
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 25
|
House
|
06/20/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 25
|
House
|
06/20/2013
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1042
|
House
|
06/18/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Redistricting, Select
|
|
Journal Page: 21
|
House
|
06/17/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 21
|
House
|
06/17/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 21
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 64
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 34
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 34
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 34
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 34
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Statement(s) submitted
|
|
Journal Page: 27
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 27
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 27
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 27
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 27
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Zaffirini
|
Journal Page: 26
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 26
|
Senate
|
06/12/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 17
|
Senate
|
06/12/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Referred to Redistricting, Select
|
|
Journal Page: 8
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 8
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|