Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 281
|
House
|
06/24/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1107
|
House
|
06/24/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#47
|
Journal Page: 1106
|
House
|
06/24/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1106
|
House
|
06/24/2013
|
Amendment tabled
|
6-McClendon
|
Journal Page: 1105
|
House
|
06/24/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1104
|
House
|
06/23/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1086
|
House
|
06/23/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#30
|
Journal Page: 1086
|
House
|
06/23/2013
|
Postponed
|
6/23/13 8:30 PM
|
Journal Page: 1086
|
House
|
06/23/2013
|
Motion to table fails
|
|
Journal Page: 1085
|
House
|
06/23/2013
|
Motion to postpone
|
|
Journal Page: 1085
|
House
|
06/23/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1085
|
House
|
06/23/2013
|
Resumed consideration
|
|
Journal Page: 1078
|
House
|
06/23/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1070
|
House
|
06/21/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1052
|
House
|
06/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#18
|
Journal Page: 1052
|
House
|
06/21/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1052
|
House
|
06/21/2013
|
Amendment tabled
|
3-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 1052
|
House
|
06/21/2013
|
Point of order overruled (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 1051
|
House
|
06/21/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
3-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 1051
|
House
|
06/21/2013
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
1-Schaefer
|
Journal Page: 1051
|
House
|
06/21/2013
|
Amendment amended
|
2-Moody
|
Journal Page: 1050
|
House
|
06/21/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1048
|
House
|
06/21/2013
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1042
|
House
|
06/19/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 21
|
House
|
06/17/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 21
|
House
|
06/17/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 22
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 64
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 37
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 37
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 37
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 37
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 31
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 31
|
Senate
|
06/12/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 23
|
Senate
|
06/12/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 16
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 16
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|