Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Statement(s) submitted
|
|
Journal Page: 307
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 307
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Previous question ordered
|
|
Journal Page: 307
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 307
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Motion to table prevails
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Point of order overruled
|
|
Journal Page: 306
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Motion to table
|
|
Journal Page: 306
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Motion to appeal ruling
|
|
Journal Page: 306
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Point of order sustained
|
|
Journal Page: 306
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Point of order
|
|
Journal Page: 306
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 298
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 297
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 288
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 283
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
Motion to suspend rules fails
|
|
Journal Page: 283
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 281
|
House
|
06/24/2013
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1117
|
House
|
06/24/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1117
|
House
|
06/24/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1116
|
House
|
06/24/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1116
|
House
|
06/24/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1102
|
House
|
06/24/2013
|
Motion prevails
|
|
Journal Page: 1101
|
House
|
06/24/2013
|
Motion for the previous question
|
|
Journal Page: 1101
|
House
|
06/24/2013
|
Amendment tabled
|
13-Alonzo
|
Journal Page: 1100
|
House
|
06/23/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1095
|
House
|
06/23/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#37
|
Journal Page: 1094
|
House
|
06/23/2013
|
Amendment tabled
|
7-E. Rodriguez
|
Journal Page: 1094
|
House
|
06/23/2013
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 1092
|
House
|
06/23/2013
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 32
|
Journal Page: 1092
|
House
|
06/23/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
5-Howard
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
House
|
06/23/2013
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
4-Howard
|
Journal Page: 1089
|
House
|
06/23/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1087
|
House
|
06/23/2013
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 1084
|
House
|
06/23/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1084
|
House
|
06/23/2013
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1114
|
House
|
06/21/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2013
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1041
|
House
|
06/20/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1041
|
House
|
06/20/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1042
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 73
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
Statement(s) submitted
|
|
Journal Page: 69
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 68
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 68
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 68
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 68
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 63
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
FA1 Hegar
|
Journal Page: 62
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 62
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 62
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA20 Deuell
|
Journal Page: 62
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 62
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
Amendment to amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 62
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Hegar
|
Journal Page: 46
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 46
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
Point of order
|
|
Journal Page: 46
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 46
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 63
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 38
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 15
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 15
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|