Senate
|
07/30/2013
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 91
|
Senate
|
07/29/2013
|
Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
SCR 1
|
Journal Page: 87
|
House
|
07/29/2013
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 204
|
House
|
07/29/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 204
|
House
|
07/29/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#49
|
Journal Page: 203
|
House
|
07/29/2013
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 199
|
House
|
07/29/2013
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR 155
|
Journal Page: 195
|
Senate
|
07/29/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 83
|
Senate
|
07/29/2013
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 108
|
Journal Page: 79
|
House
|
07/28/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/28/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 88
|
House
|
07/26/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
07/25/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
07/25/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 183
|
House
|
07/25/2013
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 183
|
Senate
|
07/25/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 70
|
Senate
|
07/25/2013
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 70
|
Senate
|
07/25/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 70
|
Senate
|
07/25/2013
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 70
|
Senate
|
07/25/2013
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 70
|
House
|
07/25/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 181
|
House
|
07/25/2013
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 181
|
House
|
07/25/2013
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 181
|
House
|
07/25/2013
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 181
|
House
|
07/25/2013
|
1 hr. notice-to suspend rules
|
|
Journal Page: 172
|
House
|
07/25/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 183
|
Senate
|
07/25/2013
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 85
|
Senate
|
07/25/2013
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 84
|
Senate
|
07/25/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 67
|
Senate
|
07/25/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 67
|
Senate
|
07/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 67
|
Senate
|
07/25/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 67
|
Senate
|
07/25/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 66
|
Senate
|
07/25/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 66
|
Senate
|
07/25/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 66
|
Senate
|
07/25/2013
|
Ordered not printed
|
|
Journal Page: 66
|
Senate
|
07/25/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 72
|
Senate
|
07/25/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/19/2013
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 60
|
Senate
|
07/19/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 60
|
Senate
|
07/19/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 55
|
House
|
07/19/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 184
|
House
|
07/18/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 164
|
House
|
07/18/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#41
|
Journal Page: 163
|
House
|
07/18/2013
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 163
|
House
|
07/18/2013
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
3-Howard
|
Journal Page: 160
|
House
|
07/18/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 160
|
House
|
07/18/2013
|
Amended
|
2-Lozano, Oliveira, and Deshotel
|
Journal Page: 159
|
House
|
07/18/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 159
|
House
|
07/18/2013
|
Postponed
|
7/18/13 3:15 PM
|
Journal Page: 142
|
House
|
07/18/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 142
|
House
|
07/15/2013
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 136
|
House
|
07/15/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 136
|
House
|
07/15/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 136
|
House
|
07/15/2013
|
Amended
|
4-Lavender
|
Journal Page: 135
|
House
|
07/15/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 132
|
House
|
07/15/2013
|
Postponed
|
7/15/13 3:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 118
|
House
|
07/15/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 118
|
House
|
07/15/2013
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
07/12/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
07/12/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
07/12/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
07/11/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 138
|
House
|
07/11/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
07/11/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
07/11/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
07/09/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
07/09/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
07/09/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
07/09/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
07/01/2013
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 6
|
House
|
07/01/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 6
|
House
|
07/01/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|