House | 07/11/2013 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 111 | |
House | 07/11/2013 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 2 | Journal Page: 76 |
House | 07/11/2013 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 07/09/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 07/09/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 07/09/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 07/09/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 72 | |
House | 07/09/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 07/09/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 07/08/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 07/08/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 07/08/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 07/08/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 07/01/2013 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 5 | |
House | 07/01/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 5 | |
House | 06/27/2013 | Filed |