Texas 2013 - 83rd 2nd C.S.

Texas House Bill HB62 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            83S20545 CJC-D
 By: Lavender H.B. No. 62


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to providing funding for certain transportation projects,
 including port-related transportation projects; making
 appropriations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 152, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 152.1223 to read as follows:
 Sec. 152.1223.  ALLOCATION OF CERTAIN TAX REVENUE TO STATE
 HIGHWAY FUND. (a)  Notwithstanding Section 152.122, in each state
 fiscal year beginning on or after September 1, 2015, the
 comptroller shall deposit to the credit of the state highway fund an
 amount of money that is equal to 33-1/3 percent of the money that:
 (1)  is received under Sections 152.043, 152.045,
 152.047, and 152.121 and is remaining after the comptroller makes
 the allocation required by Section 152.1222; and
 (2)  exceeds the first $3 billion of money described by
 Subdivision (1) that is received in that fiscal year.
 (b)  Money deposited to the credit of the state highway fund
 under this section may be appropriated only:
 (1)  for a purpose authorized by Section 7-a, Article
 VIII, Texas Constitution;
 (2)  to repay the principal and interest on general
 obligation bonds issued as authorized by Section 49-p, Article III,
 Texas Constitution; or
 (3)  to pay for a function performed by or under the
 supervision of the Texas Department of Transportation.
 SECTION 2.  Section 55.002, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  The commission may use money from the Texas mobility
 fund to provide funding, including through a loan, for a port
 security project, a port transportation project, or a project
 eligible for funding under Subsection (c).
 SECTION 3.  (a)  In this section, "biennial state taxes and
 fees general revenue estimate" means the amount of revenue stated
 in the comptroller's estimate provided in advance of the regular
 legislative session as required by Section 49a, Article III, Texas
 Constitution, that, based on the laws in effect at the time the
 estimate is made, is anticipated to be received by and for the state
 from collections of taxes and fees the revenue from which is
 anticipated to be deposited to the credit of the general revenue
 fund and is not set aside by law for a particular purpose or entity.
 (b)  On the 91st day of the state fiscal biennium beginning
 September 1, 2013, an amount of money determined as provided by this
 subsection is appropriated from the general revenue fund to the
 Texas Department of Transportation for the two-year period
 beginning on the effective date of this Act for the purposes of
 constructing, maintaining, and acquiring rights-of-way for public
 roadways other than toll roads. The amount of money appropriated
 under this subsection is the amount by which revenue received by
 this state during the state fiscal biennium ending August 31, 2013,
 from collections of taxes and fees that is anticipated to be
 deposited to the credit of the general revenue fund and is not set
 aside for a particular purpose or entity exceeds the estimated
 amount of that revenue for that fiscal biennium as contained in the
 biennial state taxes and fees general revenue estimate for the
 state fiscal biennium ending August 31, 2013. The amount of money
 appropriated to the Texas Department of Transportation under this
 subsection may not exceed an amount that, when added to all other
 appropriations of state tax revenues not dedicated by the
 constitution made for the state fiscal biennium ending August 31,
 2013, would exceed the maximum permissible amount of appropriations
 of those revenues for that biennium, as provided by Section 22,
 Article VIII, Texas Constitution.
 (c)  On the 91st day of the state fiscal biennium beginning
 September 1, 2015, the comptroller of public accounts shall deposit
 an amount of money determined as provided by this subsection to the
 credit of the state highway fund. The amount of money deposited
 under this subsection is the amount by which revenue received by
 this state during the state fiscal biennium ending August 31, 2015,
 from collections of taxes and fees that is anticipated to be
 deposited to the credit of the general revenue fund and is not set
 aside for a particular purpose or entity exceeds the estimated
 amount of that revenue for that fiscal biennium as contained in the
 biennial state taxes and fees general revenue estimate for the
 state fiscal biennium ending August 31, 2015. The amount of money
 deposited to the credit of the state highway fund under this
 subsection may not exceed $2,000,000,000.
 (d)  This section expires January 1, 2016.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect on the 91st day after the
 last day of the legislative session.