E | 08/19/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 209 | |
E | 07/31/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 209 | |
Senate | 07/30/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 92 | |
House | 07/30/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 208 | |
House | 07/30/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 209 | |
House | 07/30/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 208 | |
Senate | 07/26/2013 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 77 | |
Senate | 07/25/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 66 | |
House | 07/25/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 179 | |
House | 07/25/2013 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 179 | |
House | 07/15/2013 | Filed |