E | 08/19/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 209 | |
E | 07/29/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 209 | |
Senate | 07/29/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 79 | |
House | 07/29/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 204 | |
House | 07/26/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 204 | |
House | 07/25/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 183 | |
Senate | 07/25/2013 | Printed in full | Journal Page: 73 | |
Senate | 07/25/2013 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 69 | |
Senate | 07/25/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 69 | |
Senate | 07/12/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 25 | |
House | 07/11/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 112 | |
House | 07/11/2013 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 112 | |
House | 07/09/2013 | Filed |