E | 08/19/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 209 | |
E | 07/26/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 204 | |
Senate | 07/25/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 69 | |
House | 07/25/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 182 | |
House | 07/24/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 184 | |
House | 07/24/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 169 | |
Senate | 07/19/2013 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 63 | |
Senate | 07/12/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 26 | |
House | 07/11/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 74 | |
House | 07/11/2013 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 74 | |
House | 07/09/2013 | Filed |