Texas 2013 - 83rd 2nd C.S.

Texas House Bill HR136 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 136


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Sister Mary Antoinette Peltier of Victoria, the
 founder of Our Lady Queen of Peace Catholic School in Richwood,
 passed away on July 17, 2013, at the age of 84; and
 WHEREAS, The daughter of Royal "Roy" Peltier and Sylvester
 "Sis" Peltier, the former Doris Elaine Peltier was born in Danbury
 on September 14, 1928; she was educated in the public schools until
 her senior year, when she transferred to Nazareth Academy in
 Victoria; after graduating, she entered Nazareth Convent and went
 on to receive the habit of the Sisters of the Incarnate Word and
 Blessed Sacrament; she made her first profession of vows on
 September 2, 1947, and completed her bachelor's degree at Incarnate
 Word College with a major in English and a minor in Spanish; she
 later went on to earn postgraduate credits in administration,
 education, and music; and
 WHEREAS, Sister Antoinette was devoted to Catholic
 education, and over the course of 66 years in religious life, she
 taught on the elementary, junior high, and high school levels,
 served as a principal of two elementary schools, worked as an
 administrator for several CCD programs, and established the day
 care program at Nazareth Academy; she provided spiritual guidance
 and classroom instruction at numerous institutions, among them
 Incarnate Word Special School in Victoria, Sacred Heart School in
 Floresville, Sacred Heart School in Halletsville, Blessed
 Sacrament Academy and St. Leo School in San Antonio, and St. Paul
 High School in Shiner; she was also active in the Focolare movement;
 and
 WHEREAS, In 1982, Sister Antoinette returned to Danbury as
 director of religious education in her hometown and in Angleton;
 she soon recognized the need for a Catholic school in Brazoria
 County, and through her dedicated efforts, tremendous
 organizational skill, and heartfelt prayers, Our Lady Queen of
 Peace Catholic School opened on September 2, 1986; the Richwood
 school won accreditation from the Texas Education Agency two years
 later; Sister Antoinette guided the school as principal until 1990,
 when the first lay principal was hired, and then continued to serve
 as development director; and
 WHEREAS, This esteemed educator shared her musical gifts by
 giving lessons to hundreds of students, and she played a key role in
 the production of a 1966 pageant celebrating her congregation's
 100th anniversary in Victoria; in addition to composing many of the
 songs, she helped with costuming; and
 WHEREAS, Following her retirement in 1995, Sister Antoinette
 moved to the Incarnate Word Convent, where she assisted in the
 infirmary, performed household duties, and ministered weekly with a
 Cenacle Prayer Group; she entered into the Apostolate of Prayer and
 Suffering, and she enjoyed making and repairing rosaries and
 restoring and painting statues; and
 WHEREAS, Sister Mary Antoinette Peltier exemplified the
 highest ideals of her vocation, and although she will be deeply
 missed, her selfless contributions will continue to resonate in the
 years to come; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 83rd Texas
 Legislature, 2nd Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the memory
 of Sister Mary Antoinette Peltier and extend sincere condolences to
 the members of her family: to her brothers, Harold Robert Peltier
 and his wife, Joyce Peltier, and Gerald Norbert Peltier and his
 wife, Frances "Patsy" Peltier; to her sister-in-law, Bobbye
 Peltier; to her brother-in-law, Pete Waguespack; and to her many
 other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Sister
 Antoinette.
 Bonnen of Brazoria
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 136 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on July 25, 2013.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House