H.R. No. 193 R E S O L U T I O N WHEREAS, August 18, 2013, marks the 200th anniversary of the Battle of Medina, the deadliest conflict in Texas history; and WHEREAS, Over the course of some four hours on August 18, 1813, the Spanish Royal Army annihilated the republican army of Texas in a sandy oak forest region south of San Antonio, an area known as el encinal de Medina; fewer than 100 of the defeated rebels escaped with their lives, and the rout brought to a catastrophic end an early chapter in the history of Texas' quest for independence; and WHEREAS, The battle occurred against a backdrop of rising upheaval in the New World; in 1812, with unrest roiling throughout Latin America, adventurers organized an attempt to wrest Texas from Spain; their Republican Army of the North crossed from Louisiana into Texas in August and captured Nacogdoches, Trinidad de Salcedo, La Bahia, and finally San Antonio; along the way, the army swelled with recruits from among the Tejanos; the revolutionaries declared independence for the "State of Texas" on April 6, 1813; and WHEREAS, Spain would not yield Texas so easily, however, and the Spanish general Joaquin de Arredondo set out from Laredo for San Antonio with a body of troops; in the meantime, the leadership of the insurgents was riven by intrigue and internal dissension that undermined military discipline; a number of seasoned veterans left the republican army, and its command was assumed by General Jose Alvarez de Toledo; on August 15, 1813, as a Spanish force of about 2,000 soldiers advanced on San Antonio, General Toledo headed south toward the encinal to engage the royalists; Toledo's army of approximately 1,400 included more than 800 Mexicans and Tejanos, about 300 Anglos, a few Native Americans, and one African slave; and WHEREAS, On the morning of August 18, Spanish scouts lured the republican troops into an ambush: while rebels commanded by Miguel Menchaca wore themselves out struggling through deep sand in pursuit of a single cavalry unit, General Arredondo prepared fortifications in a concealed ridgetop position; the royalists barraged the republicans when they came within range, killing more than 800 on the main battlefield before chasing down the retreating survivors; on the royalist side, only 55 perished; and WHEREAS, The victorious general set about crushing the insurrection, executing about 300 more rebels and taking brutal reprisals on the general population in San Antonio and beyond; it is estimated that more than 40 percent of Texas inhabitants perished in the aftermath of the battle; one of General Arredondo's lieutenants was then-19-year-old Antonio Lopez de Santa Anna, future general and president of Mexico, who historians believe may well have patterned his policies in the Texas Revolution on General Arredondo's draconian measures; and WHEREAS, This devastating battle was eventually overshadowed in the annals of the Lone Star State by subsequent events, which it helped to set in motion; the precise location of the battlefield was lost to memory, but in recent years, historians have narrowed their search while raising awareness of the importance of this epic conflict; although the royalists won a decisive victory, the Spanish Crown lost any remaining vestiges of loyalty in the province, and the spirit of independence ultimately proved the mightiest force of all; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 83rd Texas Legislature, 2nd Called Session, hereby commemorate the 200th anniversary of the Battle of Medina and encourage all Texans to learn more about this pivotal episode in the history of our state. Guillen ______________________________ Speaker of the House I certify that H.R. No. 193 was adopted by the House on July 30, 2013, by a non-record vote. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House