Texas 2013 - 83rd 2nd C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SR78 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 78
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas is pleased to
 recognize the State of Texas Anniversary Remembrance Day
 Foundation's Texas Bison Student Study Group for its efforts to
 launch the Official State Bison Herd of Texas Fund; and
 WHEREAS, The State of Texas Anniversary Remembrance Day
 Foundation, also known as the STAR Day Foundation, was organized
 on July 31, 1998, as a nonprofit organization to carry out the
 legislative intent of the STAR Day bill, S.B. 1656, Acts of the
 76th Legislature, 1999, which was filed at the request of a
 Galveston County seventh grade student and originally proposed
 in a Texas history class paper; the foundation's mission is to
 plan, develop, and conduct an appropriate and patriotic State of
 Texas birthday celebration on February 19 of each year in
 partnership with Texas schools and other organizations to
 inspire a greater appreciation for the history of the state; and
 WHEREAS, The STAR Day Foundation has since 2000 organized
 and sponsored student study groups as after-school enrichment
 programs to provide students with the opportunity to plan and
 conduct STAR Day celebration programs at their respective schools
 and to study topics related to conservation, preservation, and
 restoration; and
 WHEREAS, Among those study groups are the Texas Silver
 Student Study Group, which was organized in the Presidio
 Independent School District at Lucy Rede Franco Middle School in
 2006 to explore and discover the science, technology,
 engineering, and mathematical principles of mining being
 implemented at the Shafter Silver Mine in Presidio County; the
 study group worked to effect the designation of silver as the
 official State Precious Metal of Texas during the 80th Texas
 Legislature in 2007; and
 WHEREAS, The Texas Bison Student Study Group was organized
 at the same school on September 12, 2010, to study the history and
 origin of the Texas Plains bison, especially the official State
 Bison Herd of Texas at Caprock Canyons State Park; additional
 goals of the group were to study the history and culture of Native
 American people who hunted bison, to study and evaluate the
 feasibility of the use of Texas bison meat as a component of
 school lunch programs, to investigate and propose ways to raise
 funds to support the conservation work of the official State
 Bison Herd of Texas management team at Caprock Canyons State
 Park, and to plan, develop, and conduct expeditions to visit the
 state park and Texas bison ranches to see bison and experience
 bison ranching firsthand; and
 WHEREAS, The Texas Bison Student Study Group worked with
 legislators to achieve the designation of the Goodnight Texas
 Plains Bison Herd at Caprock Canyons State Park as the official
 State Bison Herd of Texas during the 82nd Texas Legislature in
 2011; during the 83rd Texas Legislature in 2013, the group also
 successfully advocated for the designation of September 12 as
 Mary Ann "Molly" Goodnight Day and March 5 as Charles Goodnight
 Day to honor and recognize both individuals for leading the
 effort to save the herd now known as the official State Bison Herd
 of Texas; and
 WHEREAS, The Official State Bison Herd of Texas Fund was
 proposed by the Texas Bison Student Study Group in 2012 as a
 collaborative long-term statewide fund-raising effort to
 establish and maintain a permanent endowment fund whose annual
 interest shall be presented as a grant by the STAR Day Foundation
 on September 12 each year to the management team at Caprock
 Canyons State Park to assist in their efforts to save the
 official State Bison Herd of Texas as a state treasure for the
 people of Texas; the fund was formally announced during the
 annual Spirit of STAR Day celebration conducted on STAR Day,
 February 19, 2013, in the Texas State Capitol Rotunda; and
 WHEREAS, Since silver is now the official State Precious
 Metal of Texas, the STAR Day Foundation is initiating an economic
 development effort to create an Official State Bison Herd of
 Texas Donation Coin minted from pure silver mined from the Shafter
 Silver Mine in Presidio County to be offered as a donation premium to
 donors supporting the Official State Bison Herd of Texas Fund; and
 WHEREAS, The Official State Bison Herd of Texas Fund is
 being formally launched by the STAR Day Foundation and its
 volunteers on Mary Ann "Molly" Goodnight Day, September 12, 2013,
 at Caprock Canyons State Park; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 83rd
 Legislature, 2nd Called Session, hereby commend the STAR Day
 Foundation and congratulate the Texas Bison Student Study Group
 and its volunteers on their efforts to launch the Official State
 Bison Herd of Texas Fund and extend to all sincere best wishes for
 success; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 the Texas Bison Student Study Group and the STAR Day Foundation
 as an expression of high regard from the Texas Senate.
 Rodriguez
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on July 25, 2013.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate