E
|
08/07/2013
|
Effective on adoption of const. amendment
|
|
|
E
|
08/07/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 41
|
E
|
08/07/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 41
|
E
|
08/06/2013
|
Sent to the Comptroller
|
|
Journal Page: 41
|
Senate
|
08/06/2013
|
Signed in Senate-Art III Sec 49a Tx. Const.
|
|
Journal Page: 16
|
House
|
08/05/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 39
|
House
|
08/05/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 41
|
Senate
|
08/05/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 16
|
House
|
08/05/2013
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 32
|
House
|
08/05/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 33
|
House
|
08/05/2013
|
Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution
|
|
Journal Page: 33
|
House
|
08/05/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#16
|
Journal Page: 32
|
House
|
08/05/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 32
|
House
|
08/05/2013
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 31
|
House
|
08/05/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 40
|
Senate
|
08/05/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 13
|
Senate
|
08/05/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 13
|
Senate
|
08/05/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 13
|
Senate
|
08/05/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 13
|
Senate
|
08/05/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 13
|
Senate
|
08/05/2013
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 13
|
Senate
|
08/05/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Uresti
|
Journal Page: 12
|
Senate
|
08/05/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 12
|
Senate
|
08/05/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 11
|
Senate
|
08/05/2013
|
Ordered not printed
|
|
Journal Page: 11
|
Senate
|
08/05/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 18
|
Senate
|
08/05/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 10
|
Senate
|
08/05/2013
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 10
|
Senate
|
08/05/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 10
|
Senate
|
08/05/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 10
|
House
|
08/05/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 41
|
House
|
08/05/2013
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 27
|
House
|
08/05/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 26
|
House
|
08/05/2013
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 26
|
House
|
08/05/2013
|
Motion to reconsider fails
|
8-Deshotel
|
Journal Page: 25
|
House
|
08/05/2013
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
17-Toth
|
Journal Page: 24
|
House
|
08/05/2013
|
Amended
|
11-Lavender
|
Journal Page: 20
|
House
|
08/05/2013
|
Motion to table fails
|
11-Lavender
|
Journal Page: 19
|
House
|
08/05/2013
|
Amendment to amendment tabled
|
10-Lavender
|
Journal Page: 17
|
House
|
08/05/2013
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
7-T. King, Guillen, and Hilderbran
|
Journal Page: 16
|
House
|
08/05/2013
|
Substitute amendment to amendment adopted
|
5-S. Turner
|
Journal Page: 12
|
House
|
08/05/2013
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
4-S. Turner
|
Journal Page: 12
|
House
|
08/05/2013
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
08/02/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
08/02/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
08/02/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 40
|
House
|
08/01/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
08/01/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
08/01/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
08/01/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
08/01/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
07/30/2013
|
Referred to Transportation Funding, Select
|
|
Journal Page: 4
|
House
|
07/30/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 4
|
House
|
07/30/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|