Texas 2013 - 83rd 3rd C.S.

Texas House Bill HB15 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Harper-Brown H.B. No. 15


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to providing funding for constructing, maintaining, and
 acquiring rights-of-way for public roadways other than toll roads;
 making appropriations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  DEFINITION. In this Act, "biennial state taxes
 and fees general revenue estimate" means the amount of revenue
 stated in the comptroller's estimate provided in advance of the
 regular legislative session as required by Section 49a, Article
 III, Texas Constitution, that, based on the laws in effect at the
 time the estimate is made, is anticipated to be received by and for
 the state from collections of taxes and fees the revenue from which
 is anticipated to be deposited to the credit of the general revenue
 fund and is not set aside by law for a particular purpose or entity.
 SECTION 2.  APPROPRIATION FROM GENERAL REVENUE FUND: TEXAS
 DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. The amount of $630 million is
 appropriated from the general revenue fund for the state fiscal
 biennium beginning September 1, 2013, to the Texas Department of
 Transportation to be used only for constructing, maintaining, and
 acquiring rights-of-way for public roadways other than toll roads.
 SECTION 3.  APPROPRIATION FROM ECONOMIC STABILIZATION FUND:
 TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (a) On the 91st day of the state
 fiscal year beginning September 1, 2013, an amount of money equal to
 the amount by which transfers to the economic stabilization fund
 during the state fiscal year ending August 31, 2013, exceed the
 estimated amount of transfers to be made to that fund during that
 fiscal year as contained in the biennial state taxes and fees
 general revenue estimate for the state fiscal biennium ending
 August 31, 2013, is appropriated from the economic stabilization
 fund to the comptroller of public accounts for the purpose of
 immediately depositing that amount to the credit of the state
 highway fund. Money deposited to the credit of the state highway
 fund under this section is appropriated to the Texas Department of
 Transportation for the state fiscal biennium ending August 31,
 2015, for the purposes of constructing, maintaining, and acquiring
 rights-of-way for public roadways other than toll roads.
 (b)  On the 91st day of the state fiscal year beginning
 September 1, 2014, an amount of money equal to the amount by which
 transfers to the economic stabilization fund during the state
 fiscal year ending August 31, 2014, exceed the estimated amount of
 transfers to be made to that fund during that fiscal year as
 contained in the biennial state taxes and fees general revenue
 estimate for the state fiscal biennium ending August 31, 2015, is
 appropriated from the economic stabilization fund to the
 comptroller of public accounts for the purpose of immediately
 depositing that amount to the credit of the state highway fund.
 Money deposited to the credit of the state highway fund under this
 section is appropriated to the Texas Department of Transportation
 for the state fiscal biennium ending August 31, 2015, for the
 purposes of constructing, maintaining, and acquiring rights-of-way
 for public roadways other than toll roads.
 (c)  This section expires January 1, 2016.
 (d)  This section takes effect only if this Act receives a
 vote of two-thirds of the members present in each house of the
 legislature, as provided by Section 49-g(m), Article III, Texas
 Constitution.
 SECTION 4.  DEPOSIT OF CERTAIN GENERAL REVENUE TO STATE
 HIGHWAY FUND. (a) On the 91st day of the state fiscal biennium
 beginning September 1, 2015, the comptroller of public accounts
 shall deposit an amount of money determined as provided by this
 subsection to the credit of the state highway fund. The amount of
 money deposited under this subsection is the amount by which
 revenue received by this state during the state fiscal biennium
 ending August 31, 2015, from collections of taxes and fees that is
 anticipated to be deposited to the credit of the general revenue
 fund and is not set aside for a particular purpose or entity exceeds
 the estimated amount of that revenue for that fiscal biennium as
 contained in the biennial state taxes and fees general revenue
 estimate for the state fiscal biennium ending August 31, 2015. The
 amount of money deposited to the credit of the state highway fund
 under this subsection may not exceed $2,000,000,000. Money
 deposited to the credit of the state highway fund under this section
 may be used only for the purposes of constructing, maintaining, and
 acquiring rights-of-way for public roadways other than toll roads.
 (b)  This section expires January 1, 2016.
 SECTION 5.  EFFECTIVE DATE.
 Except as otherwise provided by
 this Act:
 (1)  this Act takes effect immediately if it receives a
 vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution; and
 (2)  if this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect on the 91st day after the
 last day of the legislative session.